**“One of the good things about mental math is that the calculations can generally be done from either direction, and a particular symmetry generally is present.”. ― John Carlin**

The world would be a really different place without mathematics. Mathematics permeates your lifestyle. Your entire world may be a series of numbers. While a number of us have discovered the eagerness for numbers, others are apprehensive and to some extent disinterested in them. This ancient system of mathematics has the potential to vary the planet as you recognize it. Discovered within the Vedic times, this math form has been helping students in competitive exams, solve problems faster. The complexity of polynomial functions & quadratic sums during a higher class is probably going to need a knowledge of Vedic Maths to beat the problem level. You don’t need to check your calculator for doing complex sums or calculating the monthly budget again.

**History of Vedic math :**

Despite having its origin within the Vedic age, Vedic Mathematics wasn’t popularised till the start of the 20th century, due to the growing interest in Sanskrit scripture, especially in European countries. Vedic math history is debated. It’s said that the secrets of recent Vedic maths were concealed within the Ganita Sutras.

It was later rediscovered by Sri Bharati Krishna Tirthaji. Years later, he was ready to reconstruct a series of mathematical formulae from these ancient texts. Five years after his death, Bharati Krishna is claimed to possess written this single volume after losing his original 16 volumes on the Vedic system.

An article by Bergson within the late 1960s described Vedic math as an alternate system of mathematics. The new system intrigued some British mathematicians, including Kenneth Williams, Andrew Nicholas, and Jeremy Pickles. Lectures were delivered in London on Bharati Krishna’s book’s introductory material. The book called, Introduction to Vedic Mathematics was published in 1981. In India, Andrew Nicholas’ visit to India between 1981 and 1987 reawakened interest in Vedic math, and lots of scholars and teachers began to review Vedic math formulas seriously.

**Origin:**

Vedic derives its name from the Sanskrit word Veda, which suggests ‘knowledge’. Vedic Maths may be a set of sutras that will be wont to solve math problems quickly and simply.

**New Advancements :**

Additionally, researchers are finding ways to form the Vedic sutras easier to use in geometry, calculus, and computing. it had been the centenary year of the birth of Sri Bharati Krishna Tirthaji in 1984 that the Vedic Mathematics Research Group published three new books.

**Vedic Maths in class Curriculum:**

There was considerable success in teaching the Vedic system at St James’ School in London and other schools not goodbye ago. Several schools and institutions in India and abroad teach this brilliant system to students and even MBAs and economics students.

Vedic maths was incorporated into the curriculums of Maharishi Schools around the world after Maharishi Mahesh Yogi revealed its wonders in 1988. the varsity in At Skelmersdale, Lancashire, UK, an entire course was written and tested on students aged 11 to 14 called “The Cosmic Computer,” and later published in 1998. Mahesh Yogi explains that Vedic Mathematics is that the software that runs the cosmic computer that runs this universe.

Several Delhi-based schools, including Cambridge School, Amity International, DAV Public School, and Tagore International School, have organized lectures on Vedic maths since 1999, with the support of the International Research Foundation for Vedic Mathematics and Indian Heritage.

Multiplications and divisions seem to be a cumbersome operation for college kids and sophisticated multiplication can sometimes snatch the sleep of execs.

Here may be a list of highly useful tricks of Vedic math to form your life easier.

**Vedic math for multiplication:**

**Squaring Of variety Whose Unit Digit Is 5**

Find the square of a two-digit number ending with 5 with this easy Vedic math multiplication trick:

**For example** Find (55) ² =?

**Step 1**. Write the last two digits of the result as 25 I.e: 75 x 75 = _ _25 (end terms)

**Step 2.** The first two digits of the result will be the product of the first digit of the number and the first digit plus one

i.e7x (7+1) = 56So our answer will be 5625.

Well, if you have understood the process try to find the square of 45 and 65

**Multiply a Number By 5**

This is a very common occurrence and this simple technique will help you solve a lot of time.

**Numbers are even:**

2464 x 5 =?

**Step 1.** Take any number, and counting on its even or odd nature, divide the amount by 2 (get half the number).

I.e 2464 / 2 = 1232

**Step 2.** add 0

The answer are going to be 2464 x 5 = 12320

### Numbers are odd:

4871x 5

**Step 1.** Odd number; so ( 4871 – 1) / 2 = 2435

**Step 2.** As it is an odd number, so rather than 0 we’ll put 5

The answer will be 4871x 5 = 24355

### Time to check your knowledge:

Now try —-9865x 5,

6822 x 5

673647836432787×5= (Let us know on comment section)

**Multiplication Of Any Numbers that consists of Two-Digit :**

**The number should fall between 11 and 19**

Every school student encounters these problems as they learn complex mathematics. If you multiply any two-digit number between 11 and 19, you know the results with this Vedic Trick.

The result of this Vedic Trick can be calculated faster than a calculator once you practice it repeatedly.

To get the result, follow these four steps:

First Step: Adding the unit digits of the smaller and larger numbers.

**Second Step:** Connect the dots. Multiply the result by 10.

**Third Step:** You now need to multiply both two-digit numbers by their unit digits.

**Fourth Step:** Add the two numbers together.

*Let’s take two numbers 13 and 15.*

**Step 1:** Identify the problem. The sum of 15 and three is eighteen.

**Step 2:** Connect the dots. The product of 18 times 10 is 180.

**Step 3.** 3*5 = 15

**Step 4.** 180 + 15 = 195, which is the result of adding these two numbers.

Thanks for taking the time to learn this Vedic mathematics trick. Once you master this method, you will see your calculation speed increase by at least 80%. A good score in Math depends on that! Try solving these sums using the Vedic Trick: 15*18, 11*13, 19*19

**Multiply Any Two-digit Number By 11**

You can complete multiplication in just 2 seconds with this Vedic Math trick. Now let’s check out how you’ll reduce your calculation using this Vedic Trick.

**Here are a few examples:**

33 x 1133 * 11 = 3 (3+3) 3 = 363

So, the answer is: 33 * 11 =363

Another Example:52 x 11 = 5 (5+2) 2 = 572

Now try 35*11, 19*11, 18*11.

**Multiplication Of Any 3-digit** **Numbers**

Suppose you are given these two numbers to multiply: 306 and 308

**Step 1.** From the actual number, subtract the unit digit.

308-8=300

306-6=300

**Step 2**. Now in this step, add the unit digit of your choice to one of the numbers (1st or 2nd)

308+6=314

**Step 3**. Multiply the product we got in steps 2 and 1; 314×300 = 94200

**Step 4**. Both numbers have unit digits of 8 and 6. This is the product of these two numbers: 8×6=48

**Step 5**. The last step is: 94200 + 48 = 94248

Therefore the final answer that we get from this sum is, 306 x 308 = 94248

You can understand the difference by calculating these sums- 808*206, 536*504, 408*416.

**Find The Square Value**

The Vedic Maths Trick makes finding the square of a number easy. Follow these steps:

**Step 1**. The first step is to spot the matter. If you want to stay close to the original number, select a base closer to it.

**Step 2**. Calculate the difference between the number and its base.

**Step 3**. Add the difference to the original number you started with.

**Step 4**. In the next step Multiply the result with the base.

**Step 5**. In this case, take the square of the difference with the result of the above point.

### (98) ² =?

**Step 1**. Decide on 100 as the base value

**Step 2**. In this example, 98-100 equals -2

**Step 3**. Add the number you got in Step 2 with the difference = 98 + (-2) = 96

**Step 4**. Multiplying result with base = 96*100 = 9600

**Step 5**. In this final step, add the result obtained from the previous step with the square of the difference= 9600 + (-2)² = 9604

So our answer is : (98) ² = 9604For your practice: (98)², (97)², (102)², (101)².

**Vedic math tricks for division:**

**Dividing A Large Number By 5**

What is your general method for dividing 5 by a large number?

What is your timeframe for solving such sums?

Your challenge is to-Divide 6753 by 5.

The timer should be started before you begin. Did you finish in 2 seconds? Okay! How long does it take? 4 sec Yes? You can use this Vedic Trick next time and record the time taken to solve the total.

**How do we move forward?**

**Step 1**. The number is multiplied by 2

**Step 2**: Move the decimal point to the left.

Next, you need to find the answer to the left of the decimal point.

**For example:**6753 / 5 =?

**Step 1**. 6753 * 2 =13506

**Step 2**. Move the decimal: 1350.6 or just 1350

#### Let’s try another: 2129 / 5

**Step 1**: 2129 * 2 = 4258

**Step 2**: Move the decimal: 425.8 or simply 425

Now you are trying to unravel 16951/5, 2112/5, 4731/5 In recent times, this ancient system of mathematics has been widely popularized and even implemented by reputed institutions in the curriculum to solve difficult operations in a matter of seconds. With the blessings of the internet, you can now access more of such tricks or even join courses available on the Vedic math forum India.